Financial history THE FINCHLEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 266403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.74k £13.31k £11.88k £12.56k £9.44k
Total expenditure £19.76k £8.72k £10.78k £9.45k £5.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A