Trustees WHITEHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Waterhouse Chair 04 June 2019
None on record
Phillip Atkinson Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Kosinski Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Paul Burgess Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
Peter Christopher Benson Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
Beryl Parsons Trustee 03 June 2014
WOOLMER FOREST U3A
Received: On time
DAVINA SYLVIA HUDSON Trustee 01 June 2014
THE PHOENIX THEATRE & ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, BLACKMOOR & WHITEHILL
Received: On time