Accounts and annual returns WHITEHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 June 2019 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 June 2019 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window