Financial history 13TH NORTHAMPTON (ST MARYS FAR COTTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267769
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.38k £6.24k £8.66k £12.03k £4.37k
Total expenditure £4.89k £9.83k £6.89k £5.18k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.30k N/A