Trustees 13TH NORTHAMPTON (ST MARYS FAR COTTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267769
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Layla Capon Chair 01 April 2021
None on record
David Hamilton Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Emily Fletcher Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Nathan McGaughey Trustee 03 September 2021
None on record
James Christopher Roy Hodgkiss Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Chole McVity Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Tracey Hodgkiss Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Richard Watts Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
James Edward Mahoney Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Heather Wiseman Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record