OAKLEY RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 June 2021 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required