Financial history 2ND CHELMSFORD (SPRINGFIELD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 268683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.56k £23.09k £29.20k £29.43k £31.52k
Total expenditure £22.18k £17.00k £19.32k £24.51k £10.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.16k