Trustees 2ND CHELMSFORD (SPRINGFIELD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 268683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Edward Jackson Chair 16 January 2019
None on record
Samantha Leeder Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Paul Frederick Wickers Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Nicholas John Ingham Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Victoria Darnell Trustee 24 July 2019
THE FRIENDS OF TYRRELLS
Received: On time
Rebecca Louisa Puvanendran Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
Karen Elizabeth Cooper Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
Richard Percy Stewart Spencer Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
KRISTOPHER FRANK REYNOLDS Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Christopher Paul Chapman Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record