THE PETERBOROUGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 269667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download