BANSTEAD MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 270480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 20/06/2016 19/06/2017 24/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £28.57k £23.84k £24.13k £24.60k £24.41k
Total expenditure £29.55k £22.39k £24.39k £25.37k £22.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £0 £0 N/A N/A