Trustees ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 270967
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Goringe Chair 22 June 2023
None on record
Barry Goringe Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Marie Drake Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Jane Holmes Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Dorothy Tuck Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Myra Anne Barter Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Karen Stidston Trustee 08 February 2019
None on record
VIVIENNE FRECKNALL Trustee 13 August 2012
None on record
Gillian Rix Trustee 19 November 2008
None on record