Accounts and annual returns STAMSHAW AND TIPNER LEISURE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271120
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 September 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 August 2021 190 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window