Trustees STAMSHAW AND TIPNER LEISURE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271120
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Skeoch Chair 20 March 2023
None on record
Christopher Hughes Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Roger Campbell Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Deborah Hutchinson Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
Daniel Campbell Trustee 10 February 2020
None on record
kelly drury Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record