Financial history STAMSHAW AND TIPNER LEISURE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271120
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £62.31k £63.26k £54.74k £82.42k £75.33k
Total expenditure £52.47k £58.63k £61.78k £59.89k £62.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.04k £5.00k N/A £5.00k