ABBEYFIELD (EXMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 271317
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 June 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 June 2021 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 August 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 August 2020 91 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download