ABBEYFIELD (EXMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 271317
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HEDLEY STUART RITCHIE Chair 13 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH Received: On time
Francis Richard King Same Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
LYNNE MARY ELSON Trustee 01 January 2010 None on record
RICHARD ELLIOTT BUCKLER Trustee 21 January 2004 None on record
ANN PAMELA HUGHES Trustee 14 October 1991 None on record
ROGER WILLIAM LAWRENCE Trustee 16 October 2002 None on record
VALERIE ANNE DOLBY Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
Rev ROBERT SELLERS Trustee 25 January 2017
EXMOUTH WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH LAWRENCE Trustee 21 November 2012 None on record
Fred Caygill Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record