ST JUST WORKING MENS CLUB

Charity number: 271650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY BOYNS Trustee 05 May 2011 None on record
Frank Stephens Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
DONALD JAMES LOCKWOOD Trustee 24 October 2011 None on record
CHARLIE CUTTING Trustee 24 October 2011 None on record
ANTHONY HOLMAN Trustee 24 October 2011
PENDEEN SILVER BAND Received: 2 days late
Howard Eddy Trustee 07 September 2018 None on record
ROGER LESLIE CARGEEG Trustee 24 October 2011
CORNWALL MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ROY NICHOLLS Trustee 24 October 2011 None on record
FARMER MORRIS Trustee 24 October 2011 None on record
JEREMY EDWARDS Chair 05 May 2011 None on record
DAVID TERRENCE TONKIN Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record