Accounts and annual returns EASTRY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272720
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 843 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 February 2021 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required