Financial history EASTRY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272720
Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.63k £22.34k £20.30k £26.65k £25.41k
Total expenditure £29.28k £21.45k £12.13k £11.37k £24.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £21.07k £12.00k