Trustees EASTRY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272720
Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Stanford Chair 05 October 2021
None on record
Bryan John Robson-Blundell Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Jeanette Stanford Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Simon Dundas Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Lesley Robson-Blundell Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Sarah Long Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Jan Smart Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Susan Hankins Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Gillian Bull Trustee 05 May 2017
EASTRY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Overdue by 174 days
EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Recently registered
ANDREW ROBERT BARWICK Trustee 24 October 2011
None on record
BRENDA MARGARET BURTON Trustee
None on record
JOHN WARING Trustee
None on record
ROBIN EDWARD BISHOP Trustee
None on record