Accounts and annual returns CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272950
Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 06 February 2024 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 06 February 2024 524 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 September 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 03 September 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window