Financial history CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272950
Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £147.53k £94.96k £104.43k £84.89k £108.03k
Total expenditure £97.00k £98.44k £111.96k £149.82k £113.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.00k N/A