NORFOLK HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 273702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £61.85k £42.33k £51.45k £62.81k £57.15k
Total expenditure £276.87k £40.99k £62.74k £34.51k £61.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £22.76k