Trustees EPSOM CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 273757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Linda Squire | Chair | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Lock | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Josephine Duke | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kasumi Brooker | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Vogado | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Orr | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Michael Young | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nina Kaye | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Paterson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Steward | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Margaret Page | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Maria Phillips | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.