2ND UXBRIDGE (ST MARGARETS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 April 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 April 2019 71 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time Download