2ND UXBRIDGE (ST MARGARETS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £37.38k £38.15k £30.67k £35.47k £33.93k
Total expenditure £33.68k £31.34k £29.03k £42.17k £41.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A