Financial history LAMBETH ORCHESTRA FUND

Charity number: 274831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £34.66k £32.95k £29.35k £25.51k £7.11k
Total expenditure £25.81k £32.10k £29.41k £25.28k £6.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A