KIDS

Charity number: 275936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.73m £10.47m £15.72m £10.08m £9.40m
Total expenditure £10.36m £10.31m £10.73m £10.00m £9.35m
Income from government contracts £8.65m £8.64m £8.43m £8.49m £6.58m
Income from government grants £71.72k £35.92k £80.00k £89.62k £61.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20m £1.03m £1.18m £1.17m £1.23m
Income - Other trading activities £78.91k £156.30k £184.98k £298.97k £216.59k
Income - Charitable activities £9.42m £9.25m £9.13m £8.58m £7.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.37k £1.08k £695 £4.03k £6.49k
Income - Other £29.54k £29.48k £5.23m £25.05k £52.74k
Income - Legacies £78.82k £871 £73.83k £80.82k £95.95k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.81m £9.75m £10.08m £9.37m £8.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £554.34k £560.03k £655.00k £631.49k £540.56k
Expenditure - Governance £29.25k £29.20k £33.39k £34.94k £34.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0