KIDS

Charity number: 275936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Hamilton Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Zoe Michelle Peden Trustee 22 March 2016 None on record
AUSTIN ERWIN Trustee 03 September 2013 None on record
Steven Clarke Trustee 01 October 2017
WINCHESTER SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA Received: On time
Kerry Anne Demora Crichlow Trustee 22 March 2016 None on record
Sanjay Nair Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Richard Progel Trustee 11 February 2014 None on record
Samantha Clare Bowerman Trustee 21 November 2017 None on record
Stephen James Unwin Chair 27 September 2016 None on record
Diana Sutton Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Mary-Rachel McCabe Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record