Trustees MEADOW NURSERY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 275966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Guyot | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Ann Richardson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Edmunds | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne King | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Peacock | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Helen Foster-Kennedy | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Booth | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte May | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vesna Osmanagic | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Laura Medhurst | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.