Accounts and annual returns PLAN INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 276035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 03 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window