PLAN INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 276035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MEREDITH NILES Trustee 09 March 2017
TRUST FOR LONDON TRUSTEE Received: On time
SOFII FOUNDATION Received: On time
Emily Kate Middleton Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Girish Menon Trustee 27 September 2021
HOPE AND HOMES FOR CHILDREN Received: On time
Gillian Smith Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
John Andrew Kerr Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
RICHARD NORMAN STREET Trustee 04 June 2015
THE LONDON SYMPHONY CHORUS ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
Lara Oyesanya Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
Olivia Beecham Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
Dr Salma Elia George Al-Nims Trustee 27 September 2021 None on record
Amanda Ellingworth Trustee 10 March 2016
SIR ERNEST CASSEL EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Hanah Burgess Trustee 06 March 2014 None on record
Hope Nyokabi Mbuthi Trustee 27 September 2021 None on record
Beverley Tew Trustee 24 September 2019
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PROCUREMENT AND SUPPLY Received: On time
PROFESSOR SIR IAN DIAMOND FBA, FRSE Chair 25 April 2018 None on record