VILLAGE SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 277111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £126.05k £66.51k £65.22k £53.29k £44.05k
Total expenditure £91.78k £116.00k £113.40k £115.55k £99.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A