VILLAGE SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 277111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time Download