VILLAGE SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 277111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosie Oakley Trustee 27 June 2020 None on record
CATRIONA FOX Trustee None on record
TONY HUCKLE Trustee None on record
Maya Sophie Walker Trustee 14 March 2020 None on record
Angela Russ Trustee 10 March 2018 None on record
GERTI WILFORD Trustee None on record
BRYAN OSBON Trustee None on record
Murali Shanmugavelan Chair 06 September 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID MOSSE Trustee 12 June 2013
MIND IN HARINGEY Received: On time
CAROL CHALMERS Trustee None on record
RICHARD GARFORTH Trustee None on record