THE NATIONAL SERVICE COMMITTEE FOR CATHOLIC CHARISMATIC RENEWAL SERVICES IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 277425
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £370.78k £436.20k £440.29k £411.68k £357.77k
Total expenditure £376.90k £426.90k £429.16k £453.94k £417.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A