THE NATIONAL SERVICE COMMITTEE FOR CATHOLIC CHARISMATIC RENEWAL SERVICES IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 277425

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fr Christopher Thomas Trustee 25 October 2016 None on record
Maria Heath Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
James Harrison Trustee 20 June 2020 None on record
Ian Yardley Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record
EILEEN O' KANE Trustee None on record
MR CHARLES WHITEHEAD Trustee
THE PILGRIMS COMMUNITY Received: On time
METANOIA PROJECT Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN HEALING MISSION Received: On time
FRANCIS LIAM HUGH O'NEILL Trustee 12 February 2021
THE PERU MISSION Received: On time
Dominic Watts Chair 08 November 2017 None on record
Jennifer Baker Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record
Nick Wells Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
Helen Wells Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record