WITNEY TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 277434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie Palmer Trustee 10 November 2016 None on record
MALCOLM WILLIAM BERTRAND BRADFORD Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
PETER FRANCIS SUNDT BRADING Chair None on record
SHEILA RICKWOOD Trustee 01 October 2012 None on record
Michael Grantham Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
DORIS BURTON Trustee 11 March 2013 None on record
Alan Revell Trustee 10 November 2018 None on record
PETER BEE Trustee None on record
DOREEN TURNER Trustee None on record
DEBORAH ANN DIACON Trustee None on record