Financial history THE COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS LIMITED

Charity number: 277992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.26m £8.11m £8.34m £7.75m £7.56m
Total expenditure £5.61m £6.19m £6.80m £6.25m £5.83m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.20m £7.09m £7.42m £7.27m £6.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.05m £1.02m £915.84k £473.33k £658.04k
Income - Other £8.70k £1.75k £5.22k £2.09k £1.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.47m £6.11m £6.45m £5.96m £5.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £142.37k £85.98k £352.35k £294.83k £506.77k
Expenditure - Governance £93.63k £105.86k £116.29k £87.77k £82.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £773.26k £942.62k £709.19k £679.81k £149.91k
Expenditure - Investment management £142.37k £85.98k £352.35k £294.83k £506.77k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0