Trustees THE COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS LIMITED
Charity number: 277992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR MATTHEW FREEMAN | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Dr Sarah Elizabeth Lowell | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Holly Shiels | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Stephen Royle | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF SARAH JANE BRAY | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR PETER W J RIGBY FRS | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF LAURA MARIE MACHESKY | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr BRUCE SEAN MUNRO | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PROF JANE ALISON LANGDALE | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR CLARE MARGARET ISACKE | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR GORAN ERIK NILSSON | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR ALAN MARTIN WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR JULIAN FRANCIS BURKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF DANIEL ST JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.