Governing document THE COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 31ST DECEMBER 1952 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2001, 24 JUNE 2002 , 8 JULY 2005, 24 JULY 2009 AND 23 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUL 2016 as amended on 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
GENERAL ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN AND THE KNOWLEDGE AND STUDY OF BIOLOGY IN ALL BRANCHES AND THE UNDERTAKING OF ALL ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE THERETO
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.