HASTINGS AND ROTHER HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity number: 278355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required