HASTINGS AND ROTHER HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity number: 278355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Turnbull Trustee 29 March 2014 None on record
Graham Belchamber Trustee 14 March 2020 None on record
Gillian Harris Trustee None on record
Elaine Saunders Trustee 14 March 2020 None on record
MR MICK BROOKS Trustee None on record
ANDRE PALFREY-MARTIN Chair 02 March 2019 None on record
MRS MARGA WITHYCOMBE Trustee None on record
Janet Cruttenden Trustee 14 March 2020 None on record
Alan Esdaile Trustee 10 March 2018 None on record
Wendy Belton Trustee 14 April 1994 None on record
David Broome Trustee None on record
Jeffrey Belton Trustee 16 September 2013 None on record