HASTINGS AND ROTHER HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity number: 278355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.70k £3.95k £3.92k £3.96k £1.27k
Total expenditure £3.76k £4.39k £2.54k £4.08k £3.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A