TOTTERDOWN CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY WORKSHOP

Charity number: 278840
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £63.92k £71.69k £69.03k £78.41k £65.76k
Total expenditure £58.38k £69.21k £66.89k £61.27k £71.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.20k