ST BEDE'S SCHOOL TRUST SUSSEX

Charity number: 278950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Andrew Mercer BA Trustee 19 November 2016
CLEARLY INITIATIVES Received: On time
MARK SCANLAN MCFADDEN Trustee 05 September 2012 None on record
Dr Charlotte Lemaigre Trustee 13 March 2021 None on record
Christian St John Salter Heinrich Trustee 13 March 2021 None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Jelly Trustee 17 March 2018 None on record
Dr Andrew William Lloyd Trustee 19 November 2016 None on record
Geraldine Patricia Watkins Chair 23 November 2013 None on record
John Warwick Burbidge Trustee 22 November 2014 None on record
Simon Richard Smith Trustee 13 March 2021
BELMONT SCHOOL (FELDEMORE) EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Aarti Sharma Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record
Edward Ronald Plumley Trustee 20 September 2019 None on record
KATE NASH BEd Trustee 21 June 2013
HASTINGS AND ROTHER MEDIATION SERVICE Received: On time
Jenifer Rosemary Woodhouse Trustee 17 March 2018 None on record
Dermot Keegan Trustee 17 June 2017 None on record