8TH WORTHING SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £64.48k £52.01k £46.34k £42.33k £48.28k
Total expenditure £47.10k £63.24k £67.90k £52.66k £15.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £18.57k