ST PANCRAS PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.44k £4.12k £3.99k £3.38k £1.05k
Total expenditure £2.44k £3.21k £4.70k £1.53k £2.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A