Financial history FRIENDS OF PETERHOUSE

Charity number: 279697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £465.97k £91.70k £64.90k £42.83k £121.91k
Total expenditure £132.02k £65.50k £67.31k £161.91k £136.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A