Accounts and annual returns NORTH KENSINGTON LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 279699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 May 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window